Rajan, Tasleem Anar (CPSO#: 94925)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 08 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015