Rajani, Shabnam Sethi (CPSO#: 51618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: Sethi, Shabnam (used until: 26 May 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SS Rajani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rajani ( CPSO# 51618 )

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHABNAM SETHI RAJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1987