Rajasingham, Melodye Esther (CPSO#: 72507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Fax: (905) 875-9172
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melodye Rajasingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajasingham ( CPSO# 72507 )

Business Address:
208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-2280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELODYE ESTHER RAJASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJASINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003