Rajasingham, Menaka (CPSO#: 60190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Sri Lanka, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Ext. 7074
Fax: (905) 472-7386
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Branson Hospital Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Markham Dentistry for Children
4261, Hwy 7
Markham, On
Markham ON  L3R 9W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 513-7722
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Markham Plastic Surgery
Boxgrove Medical arts Centre
110 Copper creek blvd, suite 300
Markham, On
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7121
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Hospital
Davis drive
Newmarket
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Markham Fertility Centre
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Canada
Phone: 905 472 1507
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MENAKA RAJASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJASINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1991