Rajasingham, Rajanathan (CPSO#: 61682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Midland Eglinton Medical Clinic
Unit 10
2480 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 2R4
Phone: (416) 266-1818
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJANATHAN RAJASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJASINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1989 to 31 Jul 1990
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990