Rajendran, Bakirathan (CPSO#: 81763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6861
Fax: (705) 740-6899
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Rajendran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rajendran ( CPSO# 81763 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 301
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAKIRATHAN RAJENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2007