Rajgopal, Raghav (CPSO#: 93437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Orthopedics
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 476-i
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4611
Fax: (416) 586-5184
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raghav Rajgopal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rajgopal ( CPSO# 93437 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Orthopedics
Suite 476-I
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAGHAV RAJGOPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJGOPAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015