Rajguru, Manjulata (CPSO#: 80470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bhopal University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 624-1551
Fax: (519) 624-1581
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Rajguru Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajguru ( CPSO# 80470 )

Business Address:
7 - 695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone Number: (519) 624-1551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANJULATA RAJGURU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJGURU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 24 Apr 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2005 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2012