Rajji, Tarek Khalil (CPSO#: 85792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1307
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tarek K. Rajji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rajji ( CPSO# 85792 )

Business Address:
Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAREK KHALIL RAJJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2008