Raju, Priyadarshani (CPSO#: 87124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hincks-Dellcrest Centre
114 Maitland Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1E1
Phone: (416) 924-1164 Ext. 3128
Fax: (416) 924-8208
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anishnawbe Health Toronto
179 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Canada
Phone: (416) 920-2605
Fax: 416-920-8876
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Anishnawbe Health Toronto
179 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Canada
Phone: (416) 920-2605
Fax: 416-920-8876
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priyadarshani Raju Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Raju ( CPSO# 87124 )

Business Address:
Hincks-Dellcrest Centre
114 Maitland Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 924-1164

Business Address:
179 Gerrard Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 920-2605

Business Address:
525 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (877) 507-7301

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYADARSHANI RAJU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012