Rakheja, Rajan (CPSO#: 97006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJAN RAKHEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKHEJA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Nov 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2017