Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rakoff, David (CPSO#: 58629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 York Mills Rd
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M2P2C2
Phone: (416) 486-6368
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Rakoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rakoff ( CPSO# 58629 )

Business Address:
201 - 20 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 486-6368

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RAKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKOFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991