Ralhan, Vikram (CPSO#: 85712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

459 Hume Street
Collingwood, Ontario
Collingwood ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 444-8606
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Ralhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ralhan ( CPSO# 85712 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM RALHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RALHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2008