Ralph, Edward Danby (CPSO#: 24150)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward D. Ralph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre 800 Commissioners Road East PO Box 5010 London, Ontario N6A 5W9 St. Joseph's Health Care London 268 Grosvenor Street London, Ontario N6A 4V2
Instructions: For medical records, please contact the records department at London Health Sciences Centre or St. Joseph's Healthcare London.
Date Received: 28 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 12 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015