Ralph-Edwards, Anthony Charles (CPSO#: 58456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
4N 449
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4309
Fax: (416) 340-3803
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony C. Ralph-Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ralph-Edwards ( CPSO# 58456 )

Business Address:
The Toronto Hospital
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
4N 449
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4309

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHARLES RALPH-EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RALPH-EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 7 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988