Ram, John Raymond (CPSO#: 89054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pickering Holistic Health Centre
1101 Kingston Road
Suite 220
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 831-9797 Ext. Ext 5
Fax: (905) 839-9984
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Ram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ram ( CPSO# 89054 )

Business Address:
Suite 220
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 831-9797

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RAYMOND RAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010