Ramadan, Fawzi Barka (CPSO#: 71055)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Mar 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1999 to 15 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1999