Ramakrishna, Jayant (CPSO#: 95657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
751 King Street West
Suite 102
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E5
Phone: (519) 954-6938
Fax: 519-579-7700
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jayant Ramakrishna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ramakrishna ( CPSO# 95657 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAYANT RAMAKRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAKRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016