Ramakrishnan, Srikanth (CPSO#: 88033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:Bharathiar University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
16600 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1Z9
Phone: (905) 235-8700
Fax: (905) 235-8701
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Srikanth Ramakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramakrishnan ( CPSO# 88033 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
16600 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1Z9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRIKANTH RAMAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008