Raman, Mani (CPSO#: 68154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 1A5
Phone: (905) 889-2005
Fax: (905) 889-2006
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mani Raman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Raman ( CPSO# 68154 )

Business Address:
312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 889-2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANI RAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999