Raman, Sitaram Kalana (CPSO#: 69821)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1982

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1997