Ramanauskas, Justin (CPSO#: 108373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 685-1200
Fax: (905) 685-1600
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Justin Ramanauskas may practise medicine independently in family medicine.