Ramanna, Raj (CPSO#: 62993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 616
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 972-0911
Fax: (905) 972-0913
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jul 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 17, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Raj Ramanna, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ramanna to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR. RAJ RAMANNA
                                          ("Dr. Ramanna")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ramanna, certificate of registration number 62993, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Ramanna, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214342 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct.

            (4)   I, Dr. Ramanna, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ramanna, undertake that, effectively immediately:
                  
                        (i)   I will cease all teaching activities and will not engage in
                              teaching activities in the future;
                  
                        (ii)  I will not apply for an academic appointment or
                              reappointment.
                  
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Ramanna, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Ramanna, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (8)   I, Dr. Ramanna, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (9)   I, Dr. Ramanna, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Ramanna was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        he engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the
                        investigation, Dr. Ramanna has agreed to cease all teaching
                        activities and not engage in teaching activities in the future, and
                        will not apply for an academic appointment or reappointment.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Ramanna, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Ramanna, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date"), and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision
                  of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct
                  and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Raj Ramanna to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 17, 2016:

Dr. Ramanna was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Ramanna has agreed to cease all teaching activities and not engage in teaching activities in the future, and will not apply for an academic appointment or reappointment.