Ramasubbu, Rajamannar (CPSO#: 64889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Madurai University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Centre for Research
TRW building , 4th floor, Room 4D64
3280 Hospital drive NW, Calgary,
Alberta T2N 4Z6
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 210-6890
Fax: (403) 210-9114

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJAMANNAR RAMASUBBU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMASUBBU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1992