Ramaswamy, Vijay (CPSO#: 96525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division Of Hematology/Oncology
10-408 Black, 555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202081
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIJAY RAMASWAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMASWAMY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011