Rambert, Julian Jude (CPSO#: 22983)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014