Ramchandar, Kevin Mark (CPSO#: 81571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TBRHSC Regional Cancer Care
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-7200
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Ramchandar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ramchandar ( CPSO# 81571 )

Business Address:
TBRHSC Regional Cancer Care
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN MARK RAMCHANDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMCHANDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009