Ramchandar, Roodal (CPSO#: 23623)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 16, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Roodal Ramchandar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Roodal Ramchandar:

1. Certificate of registration number 23623, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

2. Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession and whether I am incompetent in the practice of medicine.

3. Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation and that the concerns arising in the Investigation were not proven before the Discipline Committee.

4. Hereby resign from the College effective May 30th, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).

5. Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

6. Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to re-commence the Investigation it terminated as a result of this undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

12. Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.