Ramdass, Rishi Ramsohoye (CPSO#: 111315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  02 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
2737 Keele Street
North York ON  M3M 2E9
Phone: 647-748-8011
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 4E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1755 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 0A3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Ramdass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramdass ( CPSO# 111315)

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
1755 Brimely Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 0A3
Phone Number: (416) 290-0361

Business Address:
4 - 1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 4E1
Phone Number: (416) 244-8404

Business Address:
103 - 2737 Keele Street
North York ON  M3M 2E9
Phone Number: (647) 748-8011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Rishi Ramsohoye Ramdass may practise family medicine at the following
                  locations:  

                  (i)   2737 Keele Street in North York, Ontario, Westway Medical Clinic in
                  Etobicoke,               Ontario  and One Care Medical Clinic in Toronto,
                  Ontario, while under supervision              coordinated by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (ii)  Ross Memorial Hospital in Lindsay, Ontario, while under supervision
            coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on January 2, 2020.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisors notify the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Ramdass'  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisors  are  no  longer  able  or willing to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Ramdass' practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on January 3, 2017, and  will  expire  on  or
                  before January 2, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.