Ramesar, Simon Carlton Leslie (CPSO#: 19792)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Mar 2000
Summary:

 On March 9, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ramesar guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he engaged in an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional; in particular, obtaining marijuana from a patient and failing to make a record of 
 appointments with a patient.

Subsequently, the Committee ordered the following penalty:

1.	A 
 reprimand, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;
2.	That the Registrar 
 shall, if Dr. Ramesar seeks re-instatement of his certificate of registration (which he gave up 
 upon his retirement) do the following:

a)	suspend Dr. Ramesar(s certificate of registration for a 
 period of nine months from the date the certificate of registration would otherwise become 
 effective;
b)	suspend three months of the nine-months suspension, provided Dr. Ramesar pays costs 
 to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario fixed in the amount of $1,000 on or before 
 July 1, 2000;
c)	require Dr. Ramesar to undergo training (in a course acceptable to the Registrar) 
 on boundary violations in psychiatric practice; and
d)	require Dr. Ramesar to undergo a specialty 
 assessment by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario within one year of resuming 
 practice.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 06, 2000