Ramirez, Francisco Daniel (CPSO#: 95345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H-1289
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4708
Fax: (613) 761-5342
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCISCO DANIEL RAMIREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMIREZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016