Ramirez, Juan Camilo (CPSO#: 57442)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1991