Ramji, Farah (CPSO#: 96564)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 14 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011