Ramji, Farid Gulamali (CPSO#: 58642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of Oklahoma
1200 North Everett Drive
Oklahoma OK  73104
United States
Phone: (405) 271-5125 Ext. 35080
Fax: (405) 271-3462

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oklahoma

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARID GULAMALI RAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1990