Ramkissoon, Sachin Terrance (CPSO#: 86653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital Gen Site
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham-Stouffville Hospital, Emerg
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sachin Ramkissoon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramkissoon ( CPSO# 86653 )

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital Gen Site
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 04 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SACHIN TERRANCE RAMKISSOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMKISSOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2010