Ramlall, Awadhesh Kumar (CPSO#: 63651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Kumar Ramlall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2007

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AWADHESH KUMAR RAMLALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMLALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1992