Rampersad, Gregory Claude Anil (CPSO#: 95719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital Site
Dept of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4444
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood General & Marine Hosp
Dept of Emergency Medicine
459 Hume St.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Canada
Phone: 705-444-8606
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Georgian Bay General Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300 Ext. 1501
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Rampersad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rampersad ( CPSO# 95719 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
Emergency Department
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drvie
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY CLAUDE ANIL RAMPERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMPERSAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2014