Rampersaud, Yoga Raja (CPSO#: 65359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 1-441
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5399
Fax: (416) 603-3437
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.R. Rampersaud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Rampersaud ( CPSO# 65359 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 1-441
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5399

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOGA RAJA RAMPERSAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMPERSAUD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1993