Ramprashad, Claudius Arthur (CPSO#: 21587)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Ramprashad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012