Rampure, Jaideep Mahadevappa (CPSO#: 85552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  26 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada

Education:Gulbarga University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMR Healthcare
102 - 700 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 255-7563 Ext. 2
Fax: 5192586247
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2125 Front Road
Suite 5
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Canada
Phone: 5199781795
Fax: 5199781738
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 120
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 255-1265
Fax: 5192560265
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Jul 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jaideep  Mahadevappa  Rampure may practise diagnostic radiology with
                  the CMR Healthcare in, Ontario,  while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically  expires  on  January  26,
                  2019. 

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Rampure's knowledge, skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Rampure's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Rampure's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 27, 2015, and will expire on or before
                  January 26, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.