Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ramsay, David Alastair (CPSO#: 58878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Pathology
University Campus
339 Windermere Street
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36354
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALASTAIR RAMSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990