Ramsay, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 54725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
Dept Pathology Room 208
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76316
Fax: (905) 389-1698
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE RAMSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1985