Ramsay, John Douglas (CPSO#: 27706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2181 Queen Street East
# 303 A
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4E 1E5
Phone: (416) 231-3637
Fax: (416) 231-4774
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS RAMSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1983