Ramsden, Michael Frederick (CPSO#: 53137)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991