Ramshaw, Lisa Anna Louise (CPSO#: 68945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Ramshaw, Anna Louise (used until: 02 May 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ctre for Addiction & Mental Health
Forensic Service
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32471
Fax: (416) 583-4319
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Ramshaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ramshaw ( CPSO# 68945 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Forensic Service
1001 Queen Street West
Units 3-4
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANNA LOUISE RAMSHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSHAW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000