Ramshaw, Peter Johan (CPSO#: 56861)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Norwegian

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Feb 2017