Rana, Abdul Qayyum (CPSO#: 78259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Persian, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2060 Ellesmere Road
Suite 1
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (416) 439-2273
Fax: (416) 439-2244
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afshan N. Rana & Abdul Q. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana ( CPSO# 78259 )
Dr. A. Rana ( CPSO# 67953 )

Business Address:
Suites 1 to 5
2060 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 439-2273

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
GIM Clinic
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (647) 625-0664

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUL QAYYUM RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 May 2002 to 01 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004