Rana, Afshan Nazli (CPSO#: 67953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2465 Ext. 5263
Fax: (416) 495-2420
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8113
Fax: (416) 495-8279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afshan N. Rana & Abdul Q. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana ( CPSO# 78259 )
Dr. A. Rana ( CPSO# 67953 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
GIM Clinic
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (647) 625-0664

Business Address:
Suites 1 to 5
2060 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 439-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSHAN NAZLI RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 07 Oct 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 01 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1998