Rana, Amira (CPSO#: 84936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6596
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amira Rana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana ( CPSO# 84936 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRA RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2010