Ranawaya, Ranjit Naughan (CPSO#: 60392)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Southampton, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1991